MA S1328 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2751

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure safe medication administration. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure safe medication administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2751
2020-04-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-04-23SenateReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1363 (Similar To) 2019-11-05 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1142 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
H2543 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1222 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1864
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2751 (Replaced by) 2020-06-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback