MA S1327 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage the development of new business in the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Encouraging the development of new business in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2239 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2239 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1327 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1327.pdf |