MA S1325 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2630

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent nonprofit institutions from avoiding wetlands or natural resource protections under the so-called Dover Amendment. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent nonprofit institutions from avoiding wetlands or natural resource protections under the so-called Dover Amendment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-31SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2630
2021-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2141 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S2630 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback