MA S132 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to advancing the profession of interior design. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to advancing the profession of interior design

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S1231 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - House concurred
H1981 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Senate concurred
H151 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H205 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H3544 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1189 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Senate concurred
H1222 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback