MA S1311 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to creating a pilot program to transfer high acuity behavioral health and dual diagnosis patients away from overcrowded emergency departments. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to creating a pilot program to transfer high acuity behavioral health and dual diagnosis patients away from overcrowded emergency departments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1244 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1240 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S685 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2099 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1291 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S776 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1287 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1295 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2920
S1315 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
H1244 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1240 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S685 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2099 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1291 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S776 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1287 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1295 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2920
S1315 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1311 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1311.pdf |