MA S1308 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to zoning ordinances or by-laws in MBTA communities. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to removing barriers to creating affordable housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-05SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-29JointHearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2023-10-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-10-26HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Housing
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3743 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3934 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2702 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4770 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback