MA S1305 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2289 |
2017-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1308 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H3269 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4587
H767 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3060 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2289 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1308 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H3269 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4587
H767 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3060 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2289 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1305.pdf |