MA H3269 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting the use of public funds and resources for immigration enforcement purposes. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents

Sponsors

Rep. Juana Matias [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]
Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. William Straus [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16JointHearing scheduled for 06/09/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S846 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1305 (Similar To) 2017-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S1308 (Similar To) 2017-12-04 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
H951 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H767 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H889 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3060 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback