MA S1283 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the town of Brookline from in-person quorums. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the town of Brookline from in-person quorums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1284 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
H3850 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4112 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H3850 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4112 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1283.pdf |