MA S1261 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand equitable perinatal mental health services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To expand equitable perinatal mental health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1984 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4165 (Similar To) 2024-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2023
H4407 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4165 (Similar To) 2024-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2023
H4407 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1261 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1261.pdf |