MA S125 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for diaper changing stations in public buildings and accommodations. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Providing for diaper changing stations in public buildings and accommodations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Accompanied by H209 |
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H209 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Accompanied S125
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S125 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S125.pdf |