MA S1245 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to timely care and saving lives. Public Health.
Title
Relative to timely care and saving lives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2517 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-11 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday, May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, March 22, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 7, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S829 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1373 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2633
S525 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1192 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied H3237
H3226 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4623
H2322 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2517 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2684 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - See S2633
S2690 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1373 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2633
S525 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1192 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied H3237
H3226 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4623
H2322 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2517 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2684 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - See S2633
S2690 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1245 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1245.pdf |