MA S1244 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to build resiliency in communities through mental health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Building resiliency in communities through mental health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-29 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H43 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2023
H3940 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H3940 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1244 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1244.pdf |