MA S1215 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve oral health for all Massachusetts residents. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve oral health for all Massachusetts residents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-08-12HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-08SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S667 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1349 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H1891 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H602 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1137 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback