MA S1207 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-6)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to remove the restrictions on the licenses of nurse practitioners and certified registered nurse anesthetists as recommended by the Institute of Medicine and the Federal Trade Commission. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing the restrictions on the licenses of nurse practitioners and certified registered nurse anesthetists as recommended by the Institute of Medicine and the Federal Trade Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-05-02HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2016-04-28SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday June 22, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-03-03HouseHouse concurred
2016-02-29SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2508 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2016
S183 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H164 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied S149
S443 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1745 (Similar To) 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1990
S1811 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S198 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied S135
S1385 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1826 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2178
H3323 (Similar To) 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3710
S1317 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1357 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1743 (Similar To) 2015-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2276 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - New draft substituted, see S2517
S2031 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2118

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback