MA S1206 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety. Public Health.
Title
Relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2422 |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S583 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S250 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1195 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied H1163
S1702 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S339 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1108 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H1189 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4655
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2267 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
H4655 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Recommitted to the committee on Health Care Financing
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S250 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1195 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied H1163
S1702 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S339 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1108 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H1189 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4655
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2267 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
H4655 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Recommitted to the committee on Health Care Financing
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1206 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1206.pdf |