MA S1201 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to paid pregnancy loss leave. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to paid pregnancy loss leave
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2023-11-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1948 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4278
H4278 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4278 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1201 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1201.pdf |