MA H2265 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4566
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4566
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a pregnancy loss awareness program within the Department of Public Health. Public Health.
Title
Relative to pregnancy loss awareness
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] | Rep. Kristin Kassner [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4566 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2005 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1948 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4278
S1579 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H4278 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4566 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1948 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4278
S1579 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H4278 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4566 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2265.pdf |