MA S1173 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2633
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate Sunday overtime wages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Further regulating Sunday overtime wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2633 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1503 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S186 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied H248
S1464 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Accompanied H2200
S2633 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S186 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied H248
S1464 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Accompanied H2200
S2633 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1173.pdf |