MA S186 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied H248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish senior psychologist licensure. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing senior psychologist licensure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-22HouseAccompanied H248
2024-04-18HouseHouse concurred
2024-04-16SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-18JointHearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-04-13HouseHouse concurred
2023-04-06SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H248 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2407 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2553
H4262 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2024
H4560 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4615 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H3911

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback