MA S1170 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote healthy communities and the environment. Public Health.
Title
To promote healthy communities and the environment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2422 |
2017-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S743 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2344
S1831 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1883 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1834 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H216 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
H1591 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H666 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1665 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
S1831 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1883 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1834 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H216 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
H1591 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H666 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1665 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1170 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1170.pdf |