MA S115 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2145

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure responsible bond issuance in the Commonwealth. Community Development and Small Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure responsible bond issuance in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-29SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2145
2015-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses

Same As/Similar To

S2145 (Replaced by) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2300 (Similar To) 2017-01-14 - Pocket vetoed
H2770 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3520 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3880 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2016
H3931 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback