MA H3931 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Initiative petition of Jerald N. Fishbein and others for the passage of An Act Massachusetts Fair Health Care Pricing Act (House, No. 3931). Financial Services.
Title
Massachusetts Fair Health Care Pricing Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-01-19 | House | House concurred with the Senate in its reference |
2016-01-19 | House | House receded from its reference |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the reference to the committee on Financial Services and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3931 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3931.pdf |