MA S1147 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a commission to study the effects of unfunded mandates on municipalities. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Creating a commission to study the effects of unfunded mandates on municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S194 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S891 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S923 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S304 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
H2464 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1949 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1096 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S891 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S923 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S304 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
H2464 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1949 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1096 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1147 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1147.pdf |