MA S1143 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the participation of health care professionals in the torture and abuse of prisoners. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting the participation of health care professionals in the torture and abuse of prisoners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2356 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1327 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1090 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S601 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S513 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1327 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1090 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S601 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S513 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1143.pdf |