MA S1141 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Further regulate certain public employees creditable retirement service time for active service in the armed forces
Title
Further regulating certain public employees creditable retirement service time for active service in the armed forces.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Menard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-04 | No further action taken | |
2010-04-20 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-03-08 | Accompanied H2994 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2994 (Replaced by) 2010-03-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S1141 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1465&generalCourtId=2 |