MA S1133 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow simple majority voting. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To allow simple majority voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S380 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S366 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S2052 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H376 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2088 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2106 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H372 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H373 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S366 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S2052 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H376 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2088 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2106 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H372 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H373 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1133.pdf |