MA S1133 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2368
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-29 - Accompanied H2368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-29 - Accompanied H2368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to certified professional midwives. Public Health.
Title
Relative to certified professional midwives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-29 | House | Accompanied H2368 |
2011-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2368 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1133 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13826&generalCourtId=1 |