MA H2368 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1133
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certified professional midwives. Public Health.
Title
Relative to certified professional midwives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-19 | House | Discharged to the House committee on Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2012-07-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-12 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title, H4253 |
2011-12-29 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-12-29 | House | Accompanied by S1133 |
2011-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1133 (Replaces) 2011-12-29 - Accompanied H2368
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2368 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13453&generalCourtId=1 |