MA S1111 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2548
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restore workers' rights. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To restore workers' rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2548 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1500 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3430 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3298 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1522 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2122 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1597 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3430 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3298 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1522 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2122 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1597 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1111 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1111.pdf |