MA S1101 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2548
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the documentation of contracted workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the documentation of contracted workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2548 |
2019-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1419 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1419 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1101 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1101.pdf |