MA S11 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to forming a Special Senate working group to assess the ongoing impacts of the federal shutdown.
Title
Special Senate working group to assess the ongoing impacts of the federal shutdown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H464 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1829 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H122 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4679
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H464 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1829 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H122 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S11 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S11.pdf |