MA S1098 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2067
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-15 - New draft substituted, see S2067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-15 - New draft substituted, see S2067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to adopt the Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act
Title
Adopting the Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-15 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2067 |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Read second |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2067 |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-07-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare Financing |
2011-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/29/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2067 (Replaced by) 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1098 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10545&generalCourtId=1 |