MA S2067 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Tuesday, November 15, 2011 – New draft of Senate, No. 1098 reported from the
Title
Adopting the Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-02-13 | House | Enacted |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-02-09 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-02-08 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 191) |
2012-02-08 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2012-02-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-01-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-16 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call, No. 124 [36 Yeas - 0 Nays] |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Read third |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1098 |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1098 |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2067 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17622&generalCourtId=1 |