MA S1093 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2612

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide a defense to prosecution for violations of the wiretap law for interceptions made to make a record of threats, harassment or other crimes. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a defense to prosecution for violations of the wiretap law for interceptions made to make a record of threats, harassment or other crimes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2612
2023-11-15JointHearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538
H1722 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S1075 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1141 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback