MA S1091 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2548
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation for a Bridge Employment Training Program (BET). Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
For a Bridge Employment Training Program (BET)
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2548 |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1310 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2548 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1091.pdf |