MA S1087 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2535

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide critical community services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide critical community services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2535
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-07-06JointHearing rescheduled to 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-07-05JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1373 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2633
H1242 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2408 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
S2633 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Recommitted to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
H4850 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2633

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback