MA S2633 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1373
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to critical incident intervention by emergency service providers (Senate, No. 1373),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2633).
Title
Relative to critical incident intervention by emergency service providers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 487 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 487 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #485 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 487 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #485 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-20 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-20 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a still further amendment |
2018-12-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment, see S2684 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Motion to reconsider prevails |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-31 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 487) |
2018-07-31 | House | Read third |
2018-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-30 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4850) and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2018-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment (H4850) and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #485 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Substituted for S1373 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S1373 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1373 (Replaces) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2633
H1242 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4850 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2633
S2684 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - See S2633
H1242 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4850 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2633
S2684 (Similar To) 2018-12-13 - See S2633