MA S1081 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2612

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve access to fentanyl test strips and other drug checking equipment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving access to fentanyl test strips and other drug checking equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2612
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2612 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Reported (in part) S2538
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4681 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2807 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback