MA S1075 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2385
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to comprehensive land use reform and partnership. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Promoting healthy communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2385 |
2015-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2385 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1019 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2053
S71 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - Recommitted to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S116 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S1059 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1102 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S916 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1019 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2053
S71 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - Recommitted to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S116 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S1059 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1102 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S916 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1075 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1075.pdf |