MA S106 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to preventing sexual abuse of children and youth by adults in positions of authority or trust. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to preventing sexual abuse of children and youth by adults in positions of authority or trust

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2023-10-16JointHearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S314 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1038 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - House concurred
H194 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H434 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback