MA S1059 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance the issuance of citations for cruel conditions for animals. The Judiciary.
Title
Enhancing the issuance of citations for cruel conditions for animals
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Sen. Adam Gomez [D] |
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-03-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1056 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1059 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1059.pdf |