MA S1059 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1947
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to food labeling of fish. Public Health.
Title
Relative to food labeling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H1947 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1947 (Replaces) 2014-03-24 - Accompanied S1059
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1059 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1059.pdf |