MA S1035 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2753
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect unpaid interns, volunteers, and independent contractors from sexual harassment and other forms of discrimination. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect unpaid interns, volunteers, and independent contractors from sexual harassment and other forms of discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2753 |
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2753 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1775 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H1778 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S978 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
H1775 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H1778 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S978 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1035.pdf |