MA S1011 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to compensation for victims of wrongful conviction. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to compensation for victims of wrongful conviction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, July 31st, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-05-22 | House | House concurred |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1011 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1011.pdf |