MA H995 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H70
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied H70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied H70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit spouses to provide adult foster care. Health Care Financing.
Title
To permit a spouse to be a caregiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied H70 |
2015-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H70 (Replaced by) 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H995 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H995.pdf |