MA H70 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H995
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to spouses under the definition of family members serving as paid caregivers. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Regarding spouses as caregivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied by H995 |
2016-01-19 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H995 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied H70
H2202 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2015
H965 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1888 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3871
H1682 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H967 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2202 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2015
H965 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1888 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3871
H1682 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H967 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H70 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H70.pdf |