MA H948 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the rate of payment for certain federally qualified health center services provided to patients by community health centers. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring prospective payment system methodology for reimbursement to community health centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4634 |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-08-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S620 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H948 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H948.pdf |