MA H946 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance payments for use of ambulance services. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to payments for use of ambulance services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H955 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S634 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S655 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S634 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S655 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H946 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H946.pdf |