MA H922 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-09 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-09 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the Massachusetts life and health insurance guaranty association law. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts life and health insurance guaranty association law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-09 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4505 |
2014-10-09 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report adopted |
2014-10-09 | House | Read third |
2014-05-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-12-12 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H922 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H922.pdf |